Petkova v. San Juan Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rumiana Petkova
Defendant: San Juan Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01385
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Pretrial motions (other than discovery motions)now due by 10/13/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order now due to Defendant by 2/2/18 and due to Court by 2/16/2018. (sls)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Conference Rooms 1 and 2 (203) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Settlement Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque, New Mexico (courtroom to be determined at a later date). (atc)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2017. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. The Court will initiate the call. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/6/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petkova v. San Juan Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rumiana Petkova
Represented By: David R Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?