Ortiz et al v. New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Henry Ortiz and Sofie Ortiz
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs, New Mexico Museum of Natural History, New Mexico Geological Sociey, Tomas Romero, Adrian P. Hunt, Spencer G. Lucas, Philip Huber, Phil Bircheff, Kaye Toolson, D. Baird, K. Kietzke and Allan Lerner
Case Number: 1:2016cv01396
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: San Miguel
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by District Judge James O. Browning adopting the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 46 ; granting Defe ndant New Mexico Geological Society's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Against New Mexico Geological Society for Failure to State Any Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted [Doc. 18 filed in CIV 16-0773 KG/LF]; and, overruling the Plaintiffs' Arguments in Opposition to Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 48 . (mnb)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter re 27 NOTICE by New Mexico Geological Sociey of Completion of Briefing on Motion to Dismiss (16-CV-0773). Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2018. Add 3 days to the deadlin e if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (bjp)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 MOTION to Strike 31 Notice (Other) filed by New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs, 25 MOTION to Dismiss by State Defendants and filed by New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (bjp)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, adopting 23 the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition, denying 10 the Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to Fourth Judicial District Court in Las Vegas, New Mexico, denying 11 Plaintiffs' Argument Against Second Removal to United States District Court, Invalidation of Attorney Daniel R. Dolan's Defense, Appeal/Petition for Mediation, denying 24 the Plaintiffs' Respon se to Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition, and Demand for Injunctive Relief of New Publications of New-Mexico Museum-of-Natural-History-Locality 1339 (Plaintiffs Property), denying 17 Plaintiffs' Appeal for Review of Attorney Do lan's Failed Attempts at Removal to Federal Court, denying 26 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to Fourth Judicial District Court in Las Vegas New Mexico, Demand for Discovery, Response to Defendants' (State's) Motion to Dismiss and denying 32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law. The Court returns this matter to the Magistrate Judge for proposed findings and recommended disposition as to the four remaining motions. (meq)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch re 17 MOTION to Review filed by Henry Ortiz, Sofie Ortiz, 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Henry Ortiz, Sofie Ortiz. Objections to PFRD due by 4/25/2017. < FONT SIZE=-1>Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mej)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2017. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofie Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Cultural Affairs
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Museum of Natural History
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Geological Sociey
Represented By: Stuart Butzier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian P. Hunt
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer G. Lucas
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Huber
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bircheff
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Toolson
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Baird
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kietzke
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Lerner
Represented By: Daniel R. Dolan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?