Higgins v. Saavedra et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Higgins
Defendant: Brittny Saavedra, Deborah Gartman, Mark A. Garcia, Shonn Schroer, Cynthia Soo Hoo and Albuquerque Public Schools District
Case Number: 1:2017cv00234
Filed: February 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack Granting 41 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Equal Protection Claim for Failure to State a Claim and on the Basis of Qualified Immunity and Gra nting 93 Opposed MOTION for Page Limit Extension for Plaintiff's Exhibits to Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendants' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Equal Protection Claim [Doc.88] re 88 Response to Motion. (jjs)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting in part 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Title IX Claim for Failure to State a Claim. (jn)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (mej)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 50 Rule 56(d) Motion to Defer Ruling. See Order for details and limitations. (mej)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying as moot 30 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. APS Defendants must serve a copy of this order on Sprint Spectrum LP and AT&T within seven days of the date of this order, and file a proof of service with the Court. (cda)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting 17 Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery. (cda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Saavedra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Higgins
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Mollie C. McGraw
Represented By: Julio C. Romero
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittny Saavedra
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Gartman
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Garcia
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonn Schroer
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Soo Hoo
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque Public Schools District
Represented By: Lindsay Drennan
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?