Cowgill v. Burke

Plaintiff: John Hulbert Cowgill
Defendant: Patrick J. Burke
Case Number: 1:2017cv00242
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: James O. Browning
Referring Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, this case is dismissed without prejudice; and a Final Judgment will be entered concurrently. (meq)
July 20, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
June 30, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 7/14/2017. (mlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowgill v. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hulbert Cowgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Burke
Represented By: Sandra A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?