Lucero v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Judith Melanie Lucero
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00259
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Valencia
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Remand Due 9/18/2017. Response Due 11/20/2017. Reply Due 12/4/2017. (atc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Melanie Lucero
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?