Morris v. Haynes
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Petitioner: Anthony John Morris
Case Number: 1:2017cv00325
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: C. LeRoy Hansen
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker dismissing with prejudice re 1 Petition for 2254 Relief and Denying 15 Reply to Answer to Petition and seeking to amend Petition. (bap)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Answer due January 29, 2018. (atc)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Answer due by November 29, 2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony John Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?