Murphy et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dennis P Murphy, Jacob Dotson and Dominique Billy
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2017cv00384
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Richard K. Eaton that the Plaintiffs total damages awarded in Murphy I be offset by $600,000.00 to prevent double recovery of non-medical damages; and that Plaintiffs award for future medical expenses shall be placed in trust in amanner consistent with instructions of the Court contained herein. (bap)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Sr. District Judge Richard K. Eaton. (bap)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting in part and denying in part re Plaintiffs' 155 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Collateral Source Evidence. (bap)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 99 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensible Parties or, Alternatively, to Force Joinder of Playpower, Inc., Miracle Recreational Equipment Co., Churchich Recreation Equipment, LLC, and the City of Gallup by Senior District Judge James A. Parker. (bap)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker denying 104 MOTION to Exclude Supplemental Report and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Sharon Guerra as untimely filed. (bap)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendant United States of Americas Emergency Medicine Experts (Doc. 85) is DENIED without prejudice, allowing Plaintiffs to make proper objections to cumulative evidence at trial. (kg)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting in part and denying in part 36 Emergency Motion by Non-Party City of Gallup. (mlt)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch SETTING FORTH DEADLINES FOR LIABILITY DISCOVERY. See Order for details. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis P Murphy
Represented By: Theodore W. Barudin
Represented By: William H. Carpenter
Represented By: Ronald Ivan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Dotson
Represented By: Theodore W. Barudin
Represented By: William H. Carpenter
Represented By: Ronald Ivan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Billy
Represented By: Theodore W. Barudin
Represented By: William H. Carpenter
Represented By: Ronald Ivan Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?