Moya v. U.S. Eagle Federal Credit Union et al
Appellant: Cynthia Moya
Appellee: U.S. Eagle Federal Credit Union and Philip J Montoya
Case Number: 1:2017cv00415
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Brack
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Robert C. Brack adopting 29 Report and Recommendations; The March 23, 2017 Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case entered by the US Bankruptcy Court for the District of NM is affirmed. Bankruptcy appeal is dismissed with prejudice. (jn)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen that the dismissal by the bankruptcy court be affirmed and this appeal dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (KBM)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack denying 25 Motion to Stay (jjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moya v. U.S. Eagle Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cynthia Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Eagle Federal Credit Union
Represented By: James A Artley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Philip J Montoya
Represented By: George M Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?