Baca v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carina Diane Baca
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00449
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Remand Due 10/10/2017. Response Due 12/11/2017. Reply Due 12/27/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baca v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carina Diane Baca
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?