Caouette v. Bernalillo County Metropolitan Detention Center, et al.
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Caouette
Defendant: Bernalillo County Metropolitan Detention Center and State of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2017cv00523
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Guadalupe
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack Denying as Moot 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, Denying as Moot 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Compliant, Denying as Moot 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court and Granting 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; This case is Remanded to the State of New Mexico County of Bernalillo, Second Judicial District Court. (jjs)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 13 Motion for Copies and granting 16 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (sls)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Cure Defects by 11/27/2017 by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO CURE DEFECTS (re: Motion for Copies Free Process [Doc. No. 13]) by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Cure Defects by 9/21/2017. (sls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caouette v. Bernalillo County Metropolitan Detention Center, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Caouette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernalillo County Metropolitan Detention Center
Represented By: Carlos M. Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?