Sanchez v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Sanchez
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00543
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Rio Arriba
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion for Award of Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Reverse or Remand due 10/30/17; Response due 12/28/17; Reply due 1/12/18. (atc)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Remand Due 9/29/2017. Response Due 11/28/2017. Reply Due 12/12/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonifacio Sanchez
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?