Flores v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Marie V Flores
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00603
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: San Miguel
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due by 1/19/2018. (sls)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (sls)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Briefing Schedule Filed 10/17/2017. Motion to Remand Due 11/15/2017. Response Due 12/18/2017. Reply Due 12/27/2017. (sls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie V Flores
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?