Duran v. Dill et al
Appellant: Steve Duran
Appellee: Craig H. Dill and Thorofare Asset Based Lending Fund III, LP
Case Number: 1:2017cv00690
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 and appeal is dismissed by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (cbf)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Defects by 8/11/2017 by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Dill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steve Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Craig H. Dill
Represented By: Leslie D. Maxwell
Represented By: Samuel I Roybal
Represented By: Thomas D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thorofare Asset Based Lending Fund III, LP
Represented By: Katharine C Downey
Represented By: Jacqueline Ortiz
Represented By: Andrew J. Simons
Represented By: Benjamin E Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?