Rio Grande Foundation v. City of Santa Fe, New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Rio Grande Foundation
Defendant: City of Santa Fe, New Mexico and City of Santa Fe Ethics and Campaign Review Board
Case Number: 1:2017cv00768
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting 39 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (baw)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Vacating 59 Telephonic Status Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER 58 by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Order is amended only as to the date of the telephonic status conference. The Telephonic Status Conference is now set for 1/21/2020 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/16/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rio Grande Foundation v. City of Santa Fe, New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Grande Foundation
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Represented By: Matthew R Miller
Represented By: Jonathan Riches
Represented By: Jordy Lior Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe Ethics and Campaign Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?