Romero v. TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Jesse Romero |
Defendant: |
TitleMax of New Mexico, Inc., TMX Finance LLC and Tracy Young |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00775 |
Filed: |
July 28, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of New Mexico |
Office: |
Albuquerque Office |
County: |
Bernalillo |
Presiding Judge: |
Kenneth J. Gonzales |
Presiding Judge: |
Steven C. Yarbrough |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 21, 2022 |
Filing
133
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales quashing 129 Order to Show Cause. (tah)
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing
131
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 115 First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to First, Second, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action in the Second Amended Complaint Based on Claim Preclusion (Res Judicat a) and Issue Preclusion (Collateral Estoppel); denying 117 Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Judicial Estoppel as to the First, Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action in the Second Amended Complaint; granting 116 Second Mo tion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Fifth Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [Doc. 112] for Conversion; and denying 114 First Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Claim for Punitive Damages. (tah)
|
August 17, 2021 |
Filing
129
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Show Cause Response due by 8/31/2021. (tah)
|
August 12, 2021 |
Filing
111
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 110 Joint Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before 8/17/2021. (tah)
|
August 6, 2021 |
Filing
109
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying as moot 86 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 87 Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 88 Defendant's Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 98 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (tah)
|
August 27, 2020 |
Filing
78
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 11 Motion to Strike Jury Demand. (tah)
|
August 6, 2020 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 32 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; and denying 33 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (tah)
|
November 15, 2019 |
Filing
73
JUDGMENT AND ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION DECISION AND AWARD by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
|
February 12, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER STAYING ALL PROCEEDINGS by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing
64
NUNC PRO TUNC Order Clarifying 56 Order on Motion to Compel by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
|
May 21, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 5/29/2018 at 02:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
|
May 2, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 9 Titlemax' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Arbitrate and to Enforce the Arbitration Clause as to Proposed Class Members Who Did Not Opt-Out of the Arbitration Clause and to Stay All Proceedings or, in the Alternative, to Stay All Class Action Related Discovery and Proceedings Until This Motion is Decided. (tah)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 13 Unopposed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant Juan Trevizo; and denying as moot 10 Defendant Juan Trevizo's Motion to Dismiss. (tah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?