Munoz v. John Doe Corporations
Plaintiff: Roy Munoz
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Case Number: 1:2017cv00881
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 185 Motion to Exclude Impermissible Expert Testimony and Opinion Testimony of Dr. Candyce Tart and Dr. Richard Lanz. (mag)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING APPEAL FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DISCOVERY ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER STAYING RULING ON EXPENSES by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough denying 141 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant has 14 days from the date of this Order to file an affidavit outlining the expenses it incurred in responding to the Motion to Compel. Within 14 days after Defendant files its affidavit, Plaintiff may file any objections he has to the relief Defendant requests. (cm)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting in part 116 Motion to Compel. (cm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 97 Opposed Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint By Interlineation; and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 117 Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Expert Disclosures and Expert Report AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN. (mag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Munoz
Represented By: James P. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?