Martinez et al v. Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Plaintiff: Irma Martinez, Felipe Martinez, Larry Munn, Jose Prieto and Lee Hunt
Defendant: Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00922
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: James O. Browning
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendant Continental Tire the Americas, LLC's 597 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Barry M. Crown is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 598 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Submitting Expert Reports Related to Plaintiff Felipe Martinez's Damages is DENIED. (ve)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's 517 and 520 Motion in Limine to Exclude Warranty Adjustment Data is DENIED. (ve)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiffs' 322 Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of John Glennon is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (ve)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's 441 and 444 Motion to Strike Defendant's Notice of Errata is DENIED IN PART. Discovery and pretrial scheduling matters, as specified above, are REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The punitive damages motions 310 and 311 and motions to exclude Mr. Carlson's testimony 307 and 321 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties may file new motions taking into account any new di sclosures as appropriate. Defendant's 472 Motion for Leave to File Surreply, Defendant's 473 Motion to Seal and Plaintiff's 475 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply (Doc. 475) are all GRANTED. The Court has considered the reply and surreply as attached to the motions in making this ruling. (ve)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 317 Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Brian McDonald is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (ve)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 316 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Lost Earnings and Lost Earning Capacity is DENIED. The 325 Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART. (ve)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting 324 Motion in Limine (cab)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 255 Motion in Limine is granted in part. (ve)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs denying 314 Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial) on the Issue of Aggravating Circumstances and 315 Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial) on the Issue of Aggravating Circumstances (FILED UNDER SEAL). (ve)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Represented By: Shauna Avrith
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Anna E Indahl
Represented By: Anthony F. Latiolait
Represented By: Walter M. Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Martinez
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Broadus Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Martinez
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Broadus Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Munn
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Broadus Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Prieto
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Broadus Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Represented By: Broadus Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?