Bustos et al v. Lucero et al
Plaintiff: Arthur L Bustos, Jacob G. Salazar and Dolores Salazar
Defendant: Don Chalmers Ford, Inc.,, Don Chalmers Ford Car Care Center, LLC, Ford Motor Company and Robert Jesus Lucero
Case Number: 1:2018cv00058
Filed: January 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: San Miguel
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Arthur L Bustos, Dolores Salazar, Jacob G. Salazar Withdrawal of Counsel (Holt, Corinne)
April 6, 2018 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Federico A. Moreno (MDL 2599). (bl)
March 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Arthur L Bustos re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court From Which This Matter Was Improperly Removed filed by Arthur L Bustos (Ortiz, Robert)
March 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Arthur L Bustos re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court From Which This Matter Was Improperly Removed filed by Arthur L Bustos (Ortiz, Robert)
March 9, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court From Which This Matter Was Improperly Removed Plaintiffs' Memorandum Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Arthur L Bustos. (Ortiz, Robert)
February 26, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court From Which This Matter Was Improperly Removed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Rinner, Todd)
February 26, 2018 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iam)
February 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court From Which This Matter Was Improperly Removed by Arthur L Bustos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Ortiz, Robert)
January 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Jones on behalf of Robert Jesus Lucero (Jones, Mary)
January 18, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iam)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company -- Notification of Multidistrict Litigation (Rinner, Todd)
January 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Fourth Judicial District Court, County of San Miguel, State of New Mexico, case number D-412-CV-2016-00072. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rinner, Todd)
January 18, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5598089 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ford Motor Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd)
January 18, 2018 U.S. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and U.S. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (iam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bustos et al v. Lucero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Chalmers Ford, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Chalmers Ford Car Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Robert Gentile
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Todd Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jesus Lucero
Represented By: Minal P. Unruh
Represented By: Gregory D. Steinman
Represented By: Mary E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur L Bustos
Represented By: Robert M Ortiz
Represented By: Corinne Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob G. Salazar
Represented By: Robert M Ortiz
Represented By: Corinne Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Salazar
Represented By: Robert M Ortiz
Represented By: Corinne Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?