Quorum Health Resources, LLC v. Jackson
Appellant: Quorum Health Resources, LLC
Appellee: Ivan S Jackson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00268
Filed: March 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER QUASHING 12 Order to Show Cause by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why closing documents were not timely filed by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Show Cause Response due by 11/26/2018. (ag)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Extending Deadline to Submit Closing Documents by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Closing documents are due to the Court by October 31, 2018. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quorum Health Resources, LLC v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Quorum Health Resources, LLC
Represented By: William W Drury
Represented By: John A. Klecan
Represented By: Joe L McClaugherty
Represented By: Richard James Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ivan S Jackson
Represented By: Bernard R Given, II
Represented By: Victor Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?