Thaxton v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Thaxton |
Defendant: |
GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO County Mutual and GEICO Secure Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00306 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of New Mexico |
Office: |
Albuquerque Office |
County: |
Bernalillo |
Presiding Judge: |
Kirtan Khalsa |
Presiding Judge: |
Steven C. Yarbrough |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1391 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 6, 2023 |
Filing
101
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(2) by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to the individual claims of Plaintiff, Michael Thaxton and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the claims of the proposed, but not certified, class. (ve)
|
November 7, 2022 |
Filing
97
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines (Doc. 96 ) is GRANTED. The new deadlines are as follows: Plaintiff's Phase I ex pert witness disclosures are due 02/06/23. Defendant's Phase I expert witness disclosures are due 03/08/23. Phase I discovery will terminate by 04/24/23. Phase I Discovery motions due by 05/15/23. Plaintiff's motion for class certification due by 05/24/23; Defendant's response due 06/21/23; Plaintiff's reply due 07/24/23. (nlb)
|
February 24, 2022 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants' 55 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1) and Brief in Support is GRANTED as set forth herein this Memorandum Opinion and Order. The fo llowing non-insuring Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction: 1) Government Employees Insurance Company; 2) GEICO General Insurance Company; 3) GEICO Indemnity Company; 4) GEICO Casualty Company; 5) GEICO Choice Insurance Company; 6) GEICO County Mutual; and 7) GEICO Secure Insurance Company. (ve)
|
February 17, 2022 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendant, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company's 53 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(2) and Brief In Support is GRANTED. Defendant, GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of personal jurisdiction. (ve)
|
February 11, 2022 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants' 54 Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is DENIED as set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (ve)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?