Schmidt v. Navistar, Inc.
Plaintiff: D. Maria Schmidt
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00321
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER LIFTING STAY by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 26 Motion to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal. This case is stayed pending the outcome of that appeal. (tah)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 3 Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (tah)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 16 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Maria Schmidt
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Andrew G Counts
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Wendell P Martens, Jr
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?