Hauck v. Wabash National Corporation
Plaintiff: Linda Hauck
Defendant: Wabash National Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00471
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 153 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Bonanti; granting in part and denying in part 154 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Andrew Irwin; and granting in part and denying in part 155 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Lars Reinhart, M.D. (tah)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tah)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part denying in part 136 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Testimony Regarding Design Defect Claim. (tah)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation. (cde)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 113 Plaintiff's Revised Opposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. (tah)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 77 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Sur-Reply In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss For Spoliation; and holding in abeyance 34 Defendant's Mot ion to Dismiss for Spoliation. With respect to the Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 90), Defendant may file a supplemental brief based on the new discovery no later than August 27, 2019; Plaintiff may respond to that supplemental brief no later than September 11, 2019. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauck v. Wabash National Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hauck
Represented By: David Brose
Represented By: Richard J. Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabash National Corporation
Represented By: Mario Franke
Represented By: Brian M Johnson
Represented By: Mark C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?