Finley v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Neda Bernadette Finley
Defendant: Cimino Bros. Ford, Inc. and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00761
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Colfax
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Neda Bernadette Finley re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Neda Bernadette Finley (Ragan, James)
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Neda Bernadette Finley. (Ragan, James)
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant FCA US LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (McMillan, Seth)
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Neda Bernadette Finley voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ragan, James)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Neda Bernadette Finley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Ragan, James)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/27/2018. (cm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003023 re: 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003022 re: 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SF003021 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US, LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2018-00145. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(McMillan, Seth) filed by FCA US, LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by FCA US, LLC re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Adam P. Taylor) (McMillan, Seth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant FCA US, LLC by Seth Campbell McMillan on behalf of: Adam P. Taylor Germer Beaman & Brown PLLC 301 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700Austin, TX 78701 (512) 472-0288 Fax (512) 472-0721 ataylor@germer-austin.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (McMillan, Seth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by FCA US, LLC re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Roy A. Spezia) (McMillan, Seth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant FCA US, LLC by Seth Campbell McMillan on behalf of: Roy A. Spezia Germer Beaman & Brown PLLC 301 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700Austin, TX 78701 (512) 472-0288 Fax (512) 472-0721 rspezia@germer-austin.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (McMillan, Seth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 9, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC for FCA US, LLC. (McMillan, Seth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US, LLC (McMillan, Seth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US, LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2018-00145. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(McMillan, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neda Bernadette Finley
Represented By: James B Ragan
Represented By: Gilbert Arrazolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimino Bros. Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Seth Campbell McMillan
Represented By: Kari E. Olson
Represented By: Adam P Taylor
Represented By: Roy A Spezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?