Walker v. BOKF, National Association
Plaintiff: Berkley Walker and Berkley V Walker
Defendant: BOKF, National Association
Case Number: 1:2018cv00810
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by BOKF, National Association re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BOKF, National Association (Poston, Sarah)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BOKF, National Association. (Poston, Sarah)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkley V Walker. (Richman, Benjamin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Berkley V Walker re #5 MOTION to Dismiss of Agreement to Extend Deadlines Pursuant to L.R. 7.4(a) (Ovca, Micheal)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by BOKF, National Association re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Attorneys Licensed Outside the District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2) (Feuchter, Benjamin)
September 20, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6039148 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by BOKF, National Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Feuchter, Benjamin)
September 20, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6039108 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by BOKF, National Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Feuchter, Benjamin)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant BOKF, National Association by Benjamin F Feuchter on behalf of: J. Michael Medina Frederic Dorwart Lawyers PLLC 124 East Fourth StreetTulsa, OK 74103 918-583-9922 Fax 918-583-8251 mmedina@fdlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Feuchter, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant BOKF, National Association by Benjamin F Feuchter on behalf of: Sarah W. Poston Frederic Dorwart Lawyers PLLC 124 East Fourth StreetTulsa, OK 74103 918-583-9922 Fax 918-583-8251 sposton@fdlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Feuchter, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #5 ) by BOKF, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5) (Feuchter, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 9/24/2018 (kdh).
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by BOKF, National Association. (Feuchter, Benjamin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Berkley V Walker. BOKF, National Association served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Ovca, Micheal)
August 30, 2018 Summons Issued as to BOKF, National Association. (jg)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Micheal W. Ovca on behalf of Berkley V Walker (Ovca, Micheal)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 22, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
August 22, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5985972 re #1 Complaint filed by Berkley Walker (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richman, Benjamin)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOKF, National Association ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Berkley Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richman, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. BOKF, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOKF, National Association
Represented By: Sarah Poston
Represented By: J. Michael Medina
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Walker
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Micheal Ovca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley V Walker
Represented By: Micheal W. Ovca
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?