Vigil v. Tweed et al
Plaintiff: John Vigil
Defendant: Frances Tweed, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Sean Armijo, New Mexico Department of Health, Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca and Corrine Dominguez
Case Number: 1:2018cv00829
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 21 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Joe Chavez, New Mexico Department of Health, Corrine Dominguez, Antonio Coca, Frances Tweed, 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Antoine Whitfield, Anthony Madrid, 19 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by John Vigil. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca, Corrine Dominguez, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Komer, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by John Vigil re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Extension of Time to Answer Motion to Dismiss (Romero, Joe)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), John Vigil voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Romero, Joe)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen finding good cause, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.](am)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca, Corrine Dominguez, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed. (Komer, Mark)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Brennan, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield (Brennan, Christina)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield. (Brennan, Christina)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca, Corrine Dominguez, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed of Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Komer, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield (Notice of Filing State Court Record) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Brennan, Christina)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Sean Armijo (Notice of Agreed Extension to Answer) (Brennan, Christina)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Sean Armijo (Brennan, Christina)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Antonio Coca, Corrine Dominguez, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed of Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Komer, Mark)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield (Notice of Agreed Extension to Answer Complaint) (Brennan, Christina)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel, Anthony Madrid, Antoine Whitfield Notice of Errata in Notice of Removal Exhibit G [Doc. 1-7]) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G) (Brennan, Christina)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed of Consent to Removal (Komer, Mark)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Komer on behalf of Joe Chavez, Antonio Coca, New Mexico Department of Health, Frances Tweed, Corrine Dominguez (Komer, Mark)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6002847 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Antoine Whitfield, Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-CV-2018-0263. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Antoine Whitfield, Sean Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Brennan, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. Tweed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Tweed
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Madrid
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Whitfield
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of San Miguel
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Health
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Chavez
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Coca
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine Dominguez
Represented By: Mark E. Komer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vigil
Represented By: Joe M. Romero, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?