Sitton v. Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Sitton
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America and Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest
Case Number: 1:2018cv00834
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #9 Motion to Continue the deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order. The Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/30/2018 is hereby VACATED. The Court will reset the deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order and the Rule 16 scheduling conference after Plaintiff's counsel seeks admission to practice in this Court. (hm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Hyundai Motor America, Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest. (Busby, Curtis)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest (Busby, Curtis)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Corporation for Hyundai Motor America. (Busby, Curtis)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Defendant Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest d/b/a LHM Southwest Hyundai Albuquerque's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition) by Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest. (Busby, Curtis)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Defendant Hyundai Motor America's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition) by Hyundai Motor America. (Busby, Curtis)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2018. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/10/2018. (hm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
August 31, 2018 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (kdh)
August 31, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6005108 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Larry H. Miller Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cuff, Tyler)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Larry H. Miller Corporation from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-2102-CV-2018-04650. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Larry H. Miller Corporation. (Cuff, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sitton v. Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Tyler M. Cuff
Represented By: Curtis J. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry H. Miller Corporation Southwest
Represented By: Tyler M. Cuff
Represented By: Curtis J. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Sitton
Represented By: Brooks Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?