International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers v. Public Service Company of New Mexico

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Defendant: Public Service Company of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2018cv00865
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Initial Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. The parties shall call the Court's AT&T Conference Line (rather than the meet me line) for the Initial Scheduling Conference before Judge Ritter on 12/5/2018 at 2:00 PM in this case. The new phone number is (888) 278-0296 (access code: 9998216).[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bjp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Crossclaim by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Curtice, Stephen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Amendment as to error in caption on original Initial Scheduling Order only. All deadlines and hearings remain the same. (bjp)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR**INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 12/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/28/2018. (bjp) Modified on 10/18/2018 (cl).
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Conklin on behalf of Public Service Company of New Mexico (Conklin, Robert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 CROSSCLAIM Cross-Petition To Set Aside or Vacate Arbitration Award against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, filed by Public Service Company of New Mexico. (Conklin, Robert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 Response to Petition to Enforce Arbitration Award ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Public Service Company of New Mexico. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Conklin, Robert)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. Public Service Company of New Mexico served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Curtice, Stephen)
September 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Public Service Company of New Mexico. (ln)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
September 14, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
September 14, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6027251 re #1 Complaint, filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 611 (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Curtice, Stephen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce Arbitration Award against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 611. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Curtice, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers v. Public Service Company of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of New Mexico
Represented By: Robert Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?