Mohon v. Agentra LLC et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Mohon
Defendant: Agentra LLC, Jane Does and TracyAnn Nicole Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2018cv00915
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge by 12/10/2018 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (tkl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Barbara Mohon re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Agentra LLC (Childress, Sidney)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Agentra LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Grand, Paul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (tkl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Mohon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FCC Dish Network ruling, #2 Exhibit FCC Dish Network ruling, #3 Exhibit FCC 03-153, #4 Exhibit FCC 15-72) (Childress, Sidney)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Tracyann Nicole Hamilton on 10/15/2018, filed by Barbara Mohon. (Childress, Sidney)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Barbara Mohon voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Childress, Sidney)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Agentra LLC. (Richmond, William)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Agentra LLC by William Richmond (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Richmond, William)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6082005 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Agentra LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richmond, William)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Answer and Motion to Dismiss. (cm)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ.83.3 by Agentra LLC (Grand, Paul)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Certification Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ.83.3 by Agentra LLC (Grand, Paul)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Its Motion to Dismiss and Answer by Agentra LLC. (Grand, Paul)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Agentra LLC by Michelle Lee (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lee, Michelle)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified docket text on 10/12/2018 to reflect correct defendant (kdh).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6075005 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Agentra LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lee, Michelle) Modified docket text on 10/12/2018 to reflect correct defendant (kdh).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Agentra LLC Disclosure Statement (Grand, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6054374 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Plaintiffs from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-02263. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Grand, Paul)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (kdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohon v. Agentra LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agentra LLC
Represented By: Paul S Grand
Represented By: William Richmond
Represented By: Michelle Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TracyAnn Nicole Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Mohon
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?