Albuquerque Public Schools v. Sledge et al.

Plaintiff: Albuquerque Public Schools
Defendant: David Guba and Lindsey Sledge
Case Number: 1:2018cv01029
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by David Guba, Lindsey Sledge, 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Albuquerque Public Schools. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Albuquerque Public Schools voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Howard-Hand, Evelyn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), David Guba, Lindsey Sledge voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Stewart, Gail)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Guba, Lindsey Sledge. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Albuquerque Public Schools.(Stewart, Gail)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by David Guba, Lindsey Sledge. (Stewart, Gail)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 6, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
November 6, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6119270 re #1 Complaint filed by Albuquerque Public Schools (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Howard-Hand, Evelyn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of IDEA Administrative Decision against Lindsey Fledge, David Guba ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Albuquerque Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howard-Hand, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albuquerque Public Schools v. Sledge et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Guba
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Sledge
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albuquerque Public Schools
Represented By: Barry J Berenberg
Represented By: Evelyn Howard-Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?