Maes v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sara Maes
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01038
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 4/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-settlement Status Conference is set for 3/26/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 3/13/2019. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 3/20/2019. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 3/22/2019. (kmt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 2/15/2019. Defendant to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 3/18/2019. Plaintiff's medical damages expert disclosures due by 1/11/2019. Defendant's medical damages expert disclosures due by 3/8/2019. Phase I discovery due by 3/11/2019. Phase I discovery motions due by 4/1/2019. (kmt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2018. (kmt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Allen, Meena)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/20/2018 at 1:30 PM is VACATED and is RESET for 12/18/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Teleconference line at 1-877-848-7030, Code No. 7324132, to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Sara Maes, 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (emr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Sara Maes voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Simmons, Nancy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Allen, Meena)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Progressive Direct Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2018. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Teleconference line at 877-848-7030, Code No. 7324132, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/29/2018. (kc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 8, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
November 8, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque) (Santa Fe). (ln)
November 7, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6123418 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Allen, Meena)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company 's Unavailability (Allen, Meena)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2018-00441. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maes v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Maes
Represented By: Nancy L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?