R.P. et al v. Santa Fe Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: R. P. and C. F.
Defendant: Gary F. Gregor, Santa Fe Public Schools and Vickie L. Sewing
Case Number: 1:2018cv01051
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Motion for Dismissal of Count III Without Prejudice by C. F., R. P.. (Lopez, Alicia)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tort Claims Act filed by C. F., R. P.. (Lane, Maggie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by C. F., R. P. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tort Claims Act, #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery Notice of Agreed upon Extension (Lane, Maggie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 17 and 18. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 6, 2018 Filing 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Agreed Upon Extension by C. F., R. P. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tort Claims Act, #7 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Lane, Maggie) Modified docket text on 12/3/2018 (kdh).
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Vickie L. Sewing Notice of Non-Availability from December 21, 2018 through January 9, 2019 (Gurule, Desiree) Modified docket text on 11/28/2018 to include detail (kdh).
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry A. Walz on behalf of Santa Fe Public Schools (Walz, Jerry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Santa Fe Public Schools. (Walz, Jerry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are reminded that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge unless consents from all parties have been filed by 12/5/2018. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Santa Fe Public Schools Extension to File Answer (Walz, Jerry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant Gregor's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gary F. Gregor. (Narvaez, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Tort Claims Act by Vickie L. Sewing. (Gurule, Desiree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Vickie L. Sewing. (Gurule, Desiree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Vickie L. Sewing. (Gurule, Desiree)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Desiree D Gurule on behalf of Vickie L. Sewing (Gurule, Desiree)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2018. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties should call the Courts AT&T Connect conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/5/2018. (tkl)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 13, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Gary F. Gregor of Filing of Certified State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Narvaez, Henry)
November 12, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6128444 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gary F. Gregor (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Narvaez, Henry)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gary F. Gregor from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-02945. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gary F. Gregor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Narvaez, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.P. et al v. Santa Fe Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. P.
Represented By: Carolyn M. Nichols
Represented By: Alicia Consuelo Lopez
Represented By: Maggie H Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. F.
Represented By: Carolyn M. Nichols
Represented By: Alicia Consuelo Lopez
Represented By: Maggie H Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Gregor
Represented By: Henry F. Narvaez
Represented By: Ashlee M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Public Schools
Represented By: Jerry A. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie L. Sewing
Represented By: Desiree D Gurule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?