Duran et al v. United Tactical Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Celestina Duran, Robert Duran and Celestina Sally Duran
Defendant: Advanced Tactical Systems, LlC d/b/a Pepperball, Tippmann Sports, LLC, Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC, United Tactical Systems, LLC d/b/a Pepperball, Advanced Tactical Systems LLC and United Tactical Systems LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01062
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 18, 19, 20 and 21. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 31, 2018 Filing 22 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Tactical Systems LLC, Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC, United Tactical Systems LLC (Flores, Juan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 Transmittal of State Court Documents Joint Submission of Records and Proceedings from the State Court Actions Under D.N.M.LR-Civ.81.1(a) by Tippmann Sports, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Wilkey, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tippmann Sports, LLC identifying Corporate Parent G.I. Sportz, Inc for Tippmann Sports, LLC. (Wilkey, James)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Tippmann Sports, LLC by James C. Wilkey on behalf of: Joseph J. Minock Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial, LLC 3344 Peachtree Road NE, Suite 2400Atlanta, GA 30326 404-832-9580 Fax 404-875-9433 jminock@wwhgd.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wilkey, James)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Tippmann Sports, LLC by James C. Wilkey on behalf of: Johnathan R. Friedman Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial, LLC 3344 Peachtree Road, NE, Suite 2400Atlanta, GA 30326 (404) 832-9580 Fax (404) 875-9433 jfriedman@wwhgd.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wilkey, James)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6169006 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tippmann Sports, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilkey, James)
December 6, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6168971 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tippmann Sports, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilkey, James)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 1/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/15/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/21/2018. (pv)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Tippmann Sports, LLC Certification of Good Standing for Non-Member Attorneys Associating with Federal Bar Member Attorneys Under D.N.M.LR-CIV.83.3(a) (Wilkey, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 Tippmann Sports, LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Tippmann Sports, LLC. (Wilkey, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death by Advanced Tactical Systems LLC, Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC, United Tactical Systems LLC. (Flores, Juan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Tippmann Sports, LLC. (Wilkey, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Advanced Tactical Systems LLC, Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC, United Tactical Systems LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, to Consent to Removal (Flores, Juan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Advanced Tactical Systems LLC, Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC, United Tactical Systems LLC of Entry of Appearance (Flores, Juan)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Tippmann Sports, LLC (Wilkey, James)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 15, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6134098 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Tippmann Sports, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilkey, James)
November 15, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Wilkey on behalf of Tippmann Sports, LLC (Wilkey, James)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Tippmann Sports, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 1-A) (Wilkey, James)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tippmann Sports, LLC Joint Notice of Removal from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2018-06807. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tippmann Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilkey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran et al v. United Tactical Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestina Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Duran
Represented By: Mark Fine
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Adam C. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestina Sally Duran
Represented By: Mark Fine
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Represented By: Adam C. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Tactical Systems, LlC d/b/a Pepperball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tippmann Sports, LLC
Represented By: James C. Wilkey
Represented By: Steven S. Scholl
Represented By: Jonathan R Friedman
Represented By: Joseph J Minock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Circle Projectiles, LLC
Represented By: Juan L Flores
Represented By: Jaime L. Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Tactical Systems, LLC d/b/a Pepperball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Tactical Systems LLC
Represented By: Juan L Flores
Represented By: Jaime L. Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Tactical Systems LLC
Represented By: Juan L Flores
Represented By: Jaime L. Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?