Moonka v. National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sunita Moonka
Defendant: Julie Perich and National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01086
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/20/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/13/2019. (mlt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC.(Lowry, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and granting #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. All state law claims against Defendants NTESS and Julie Perich are dismissed with prejudice; Defendant Julie Perich is dismissed from this lawsuit; and Plaintiff may file her amended complaint by 12/21/2018. (tah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Discrimination and Retaliation and Appeal from Order of Non-Determination against National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC. terminating Julie Perich., filed by Sunita Moonka. (Wolf, Samuel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Motion and Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice All State Law Claims and Defendant Julie Perich and Unopposed Motion to Amend the Complaint filed by Sunita Moonka. (Wolf, Samuel) Modified to add motion as per chambers on 1/4/2019 (jjs).
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC, Julie Perich. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Honeywell International Inc. for National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC. (Lovato-Farmer, Cindy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 21, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC (Lovato-Farmer, Cindy)
November 20, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6145540 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Julie Perich, National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lovato-Farmer, Cindy)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-02984. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Perich Declaration)(Lovato-Farmer, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moonka v. National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunita Moonka
Represented By: Samuel C. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Perich
Represented By: Cindy Jean Lovato-Farmer
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC
Represented By: Cindy Jean Lovato-Farmer
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?