Talbott v. Public Service Company of New Mexico et al

Plaintiff: Lucy Talbott
Defendant: PNM Resources, Inc., Joanne Garcia, Public Service Company of New Mexico and Rebecca Teague
Case Number: 1:2018cv01102
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/26/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/11/2019. (pv)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joanne Garcia, PNM Resources, Inc., Public Service Company of New Mexico, Rebecca Teague voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PNM Resources, Inc., Public Service Company of New Mexico (Lowry, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Joanne Garcia, PNM Resources, Inc., Public Service Company of New Mexico, Rebecca Teague. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Lucy Talbott.(Lowry, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Talbott. Rebecca Teague served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Anderson, Erika)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Talbott. Rebecca Teague served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Anderson, Erika) Modified on 1/8/2019 - attorney to refile with correct service date of 1/3/19(mnb).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Talbott. Joanne Garcia served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Anderson, Erika)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Talbott. Public Service Company of New Mexico served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Anderson, Erika)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Talbott. PNM Resources, Inc. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Anderson, Erika)
December 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Joanne Garcia, PNM Resources, Inc., Public Service Company of New Mexico, Rebecca Teague. (kdh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, for Discrimination, Retaliation, Violation of the Equal Pay Act, Violation of the New Mexico Fair Pay for Women Act, Breach of Implied Contract and Damages Civil Cover Sheet by Lucy Talbott (Anderson, Erika) Modified docket text on 12/3/2018 (ln).
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 27, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
November 27, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6150864 re #1 Complaint, filed by Lucy Talbott (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Anderson, Erika)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Discrimination, Retaliation, Violation of the Equal Pay Act, Violation of the New Mexico Fair Pay for Women Act, Breach of Implied Contract and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Lucy Talbott. (Anderson, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talbott v. Public Service Company of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Talbott
Represented By: Erika E Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNM Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Garcia
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service Company of New Mexico
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Teague
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?