Kellogg-Borchardt et al. v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Kellogg-Borchardt and John Borchardt
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01105
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mazda Motor Corporation re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Mazda Motor Corporation (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Mazda Motor Corporation. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Mazda Motor Corporation, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Alicia Kellogg-Borchardt. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cl)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Alicia Kellogg-Borchardt voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Alicia Kellogg-Borchardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Kaufman, Justin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (tkl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mazda Motor Corporation voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 29, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Mazda Motor Corporation. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6155190 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mazda Motor Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Croasdell, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2018-01774. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellogg-Borchardt et al. v. Mazda Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Kellogg-Borchardt
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham, III
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Borchardt
Represented By: Frederick Leighton Durham, III
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?