Barlovento, LLC v. AUI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barlovento, LLC
Defendant: AUI, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01112
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Substitute counsel. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mlt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by February 22, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R Calvert on behalf of AUI, Inc. (Calvert, Sean)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/5/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/20/2019. (mlt)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Western Surety Company. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Barlovento, LLC.(Gorman, David)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Western Surety Company. (Gorman, David)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #11 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. (mlt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Barlovento, LLC. (Beall, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by 1/21/2019. (gbg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Western Surety Company. (Werther, Barbara)
January 8, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6212503 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Western Surety Company, AUI, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Philipp, Meredith)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants AUI, Inc., Western Surety Company by Meredith R Philipp (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Philipp, Meredith)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Gorman on behalf of Western Surety Company (Gorman, David)
December 26, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6197948 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Western Surety Company, AUI, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Werther, Barbara)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants AUI, Inc., Western Surety Company by Barbara G Werther (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Werther, Barbara)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Western Surety Company on December 7, 2018, filed by Barlovento, LLC. (Beall, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barlovento, LLC as to AUI, Inc.. (Beall, Christopher)
November 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 29, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barlovento, LLC (Beall, Christopher)
November 29, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6156724 re #1 Complaint filed by Barlovento, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Beall, Christopher)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUI, Inc., Western Surety Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Barlovento, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beall, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlovento, LLC v. AUI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUI, Inc.
Represented By: Sean R Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Joshua A Allison
Represented By: David P. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barlovento, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Perry Beall
Represented By: David W. Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?