Ross v. Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC
Plaintiff: John Mark Ross
Respondent: Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01141
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC., filed by John Mark Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Arney, Lance)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Plaintiff is ordered to amend his Complaint to properly allege facts sufficient for diversity jurisdiction, if such allegations can be made in compliance with the dictates of Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, no later than 1/7/2019. (am)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by John Mark Ross (Arney, Lance)
December 6, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6169799 re #1 Complaint, filed by John Mark Ross (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Arney, Lance)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award against Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John Mark Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Arney, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mark Ross
Represented By: Lance Arney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?