Muldrow v. Giannini et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Muldrow
Defendant: The Rio Rancho Police Department, Officer Isaac Giannini, The City of Rio Rancho, Isaac Giannini, City of Rio Rancho and Rio Rancho Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv01174
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents by City of Rio Rancho, Isaac Giannini, Rio Rancho Police Department (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Becker, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 02/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Joint Status Report due by 02/20/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 01/28/2019. (cm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Rio Rancho, Isaac Giannini, Rio Rancho Police Department. (Becker, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 14, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (ln)
December 14, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6183748 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Isaac Giannini, The Rio Rancho Police Department, The City of Rio Rancho (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Becker, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1329-CV-2018-02428. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Becker, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muldrow v. Giannini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rio Rancho Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Isaac Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Rio Rancho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Giannini
Represented By: Robert W Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rio Rancho
Represented By: Robert W Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rio Rancho Police Department
Represented By: Robert W Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Muldrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?