Osteostrong Franchising, LLC v. Richter et al
Plaintiff: Osteostrong Franchising, LLC
Defendant: JDAP, Inc., Sheila Nixon, Roland Richter and Dancingbones LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01184
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. Dancingbones LLC served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Keleher, William)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. Sheila Nixon served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Keleher, William)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. JDAP, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Keleher, William) Modified on 1/8/2019 to correct service date(mnb).
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. Roland Richter served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Keleher, William)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Report re: trademark by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC (kdh)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to Dancingbones LLC, JDAP, Inc., Sheila Nixon, Roland Richter. (jg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC (Keleher, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (kdh)
December 17, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6187008 re #1 Complaint filed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keleher, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Osteostrong Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through L)(Keleher, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osteostrong Franchising, LLC v. Richter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDAP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dancingbones LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osteostrong Franchising, LLC
Represented By: William R. Keleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?