Gudelj v. Vitality Works, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Norma Gudelj
Defendant: Mitchell Coven and Vitality Works, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00014
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #4 Amended Complaint Exhibits A and B by Norma Gudelj (Landry, Stephanie)
February 6, 2019 Summons on AMENDED COMPLAINT Issued as to All Defendants. (mnb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Norma Gudelj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Landry, Stephanie)
January 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Norma Gudelj (Landry, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 8, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
January 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6214610 re #1 Complaint filed by Norma Gudelj (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Landry, Stephanie)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Norma Gudelj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Landry, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gudelj v. Vitality Works, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Coven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitality Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Gudelj
Represented By: Glenn R. Smith
Represented By: Stephanie Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?