Van Velkinburgh v. Gupta

Plaintiff: Jennifer van Velkinburgh and Jennifer Christine Van Velkinburgh
Defendant: Goutam Gupta and Innate Immunity LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Report re: patent/trademark/copyright - Hard copy format AO 120 with docket sheet and Stipulation of Dismissal #13 mailed to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. (ln)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Jennifer Christine Van Velkinburgh (Houghton, Breanna)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties having notified the Court that they have reached a settlement agreement, the deadlines and hearing set in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4) are hereby vacated. (tkl) [This is a text-only entry. There are no documents attached.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Additional State Court Records by Jennifer Christine Van Velkinburgh re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Grafe, Victor) Modified docket text on 1/31/2019 (ln).
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Goutam Gupta, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Innate Immunity LLC, filed by Jennifer Christine Van Velkinburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - REDACTED/FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F - REDACTED/FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - REDACTED/FILED UNDER SEAL)(Allison, Benjamin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Goutam Gupta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marital Settlement Agreement) (Barkley, Jamison)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2019. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Connect conference line (877) 848-7030 and enter Code:7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/5/2019. (tkl)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Report re: patent/trademark/copyright with docket sheet and Complaint with exhibits mailed to Mail Stop 8 (jg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 14, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
January 14, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (jg)
January 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6223482 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jennifer van Velkinburgh (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jennifer van Velkinburgh from First Judicial District, case number D-101-DM-2013-00531. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Allison, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Velkinburgh v. Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer van Velkinburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christine Van Velkinburgh
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goutam Gupta
Represented By: Amber Macias-Mayo
Represented By: Sarah E. Bennett
Represented By: Jamison Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innate Immunity LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?