Chipps v. Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Susan Chipps
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
1 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING and RESETTING a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for April 12, 2019, is VACATED and RESET as an in person Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on April 22, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the Hondo Courtroom at the Pete V. Domenici United States Courthouse in Albuquerque, New Mexico. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (jcm)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by March 22, 2019. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for April 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 8, 2019. (Recording Info: Liberty) (jcm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company 's Initial Disclosures (Allen, Meena)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for February 8, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, Meena)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Susan Chipps. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Susan Chipps voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Braun, Cynthia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Farm Bureau Financial Company for Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Allen, Meena)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 14, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
January 11, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6222828 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-05193. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chipps v. Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Chipps
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?