Maisel, et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Albert Lloyd Maisel and Jeanie Michelle Maisel
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Albert Lloyd Maisel, Jeanie Michelle Maisel. (Roehl, Jerrald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 16 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Albert Lloyd Maisel, Jeanie Michelle Maisel. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Transamerica Life Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Apodaca, Leslie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie)
February 1, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6260937 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)
February 1, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6260848 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Hutson B. Smelley McDowell Hetherington, LLP 1001 Fannin Street, Ste. 2700Houston, TX 77002 7133375580 tom.hetherington@mhllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Thomas F.A. Hetherington McDowell Hetherington, LLP 1001 Fannin Street, Ste. 2700Houston, TX 77002 7133375580 tom.hetherington@mhllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing (amended to correct case number only) setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (cda)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (pv)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Transamerica Life Insurance Company to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended until February 11, 2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Transamerica Life Insurance Company's answer due 2/11/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
January 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6235099 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Life Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-09026. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Apodaca, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maisel, et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Represented By: Hutson B. Smelley
Represented By: Thomas F. A. Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lloyd Maisel
Represented By: Jerrald J Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Michelle Maisel
Represented By: Jerrald J Roehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?