St. Paul's United Methodist Church v. United Methodist Insurance
Plaintiff: St. Paul's United Methodist Church
Defendant: United Methodist Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv00054
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Methodist Insurance of Initial Disclosures (Headrick, Amy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by United Methodist Insurance (Headrick, Amy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by St. Paul's United Methodist Church of Serving Rule 26 Disclosures to Defendant (Fadner, Derek)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), United Methodist Insurance voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Headrick, Amy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/20/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/13/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/28/2019. (mlt)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Negligence, Breach of Insurance Contract, Violation of the New Mexico Unfair Claims Practices Act, and Bad Faith Actions by United Methodist Insurance. (Headrick, Amy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by St. Paul's United Methodist Church Certificate of Interested Parties (Fadner, Derek)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L Fadner on behalf of St. Paul's United Methodist Church (Fadner, Derek)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
January 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6236069 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Methodist Insurance (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Headrick, Amy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Methodist Insurance (Headrick, Amy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Methodist Insurance from Second Judicial District Court Bernalillo County, New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2018-05533. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United Methodist Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - District Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Headrick, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul's United Methodist Church v. United Methodist Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Methodist Insurance
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Headrick
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul's United Methodist Church
Represented By: James M. McClenny
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Represented By: Derek L Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?