Ganci et al v. MBF Inspection Services, Inc.

Appellant: Glynn Estess, Gary Brooks, Gary Marshall, Larry Alexander, Richard Gill and Thomas Ganci
Appellee: MBF Inspection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough quashing #10 Order Directing Appellants to Cure Defects. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Certificate of Service Bankruptcy Clerk's Status Regarding Transmission of Record on Appeal by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANTS TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by MBF Inspection Services, Inc. Notice And Certificate Persuant To D.N.M. L RCiv 83.3 (a) (1) (Behles, Jennie)
February 20, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6291259 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by MBF Inspection Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bravo, Eric)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellee MBF Inspection Services, Inc. by Eric Bravo (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bravo, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Deden Behles on behalf of MBF Inspection Services, Inc. (Behles, Jennie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Moody, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6245070 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gary Marshall, Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Glynn Estess (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6245036 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gary Marshall, Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Glynn Estess (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellants Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Daniel S. Brome NICHOLS KASTER, LLP 235 Montgomery St., Suite 810San Francisco, CA 94104 415-277-7235 dbrome@nka.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Appellants Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Richard Gill, Gary Marshall by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Matthew C. Helland NICHOLS KASTER, LLP 235 Montgomery St., Suite 810San Francisco, CA 94104 415-277-7235 helland@nka.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Certificate of Service First Amended Bankruptcy Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of Larry Alexander, Gary Brooks, Glynn Estess, Thomas Ganci, Gary Marshall (Moody, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal and Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganci et al v. MBF Inspection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Glynn Estess
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gary Brooks
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gary Marshall
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Larry Alexander
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Gill
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thomas Ganci
Represented By: Matthew C. Helland
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MBF Inspection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennie Deden Behles
Represented By: Eric Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?