Bagley v. The University of New Mexico Board of Regents
Plaintiff: Teriana Bagley
Defendant: The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Teriana Bagley.(Smith, Quentin)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/11/2019. (pv)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents answer due 3/6/2019. (cda)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents. (Smith, Quentin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 3, 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Quentin Smith on behalf of The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents (Smith, Quentin)
January 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents. (jg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 23, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
January 23, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6240807 re #1 Complaint filed by Teriana Bagley (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Monagle, Levi)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Teriana Bagley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Monagle, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley v. The University of New Mexico Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University Of New Mexico Board Of Regents
Represented By: Quentin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teriana Bagley
Represented By: Lisa P. Ford
Represented By: Brad D. Hall
Represented By: Levi Albert Monagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?