United States of America v. Griffith et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust, Betty Lois Griffith, Jack D. Griffith and San Juan County Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. In light of Plaintiff's Notice to Court Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith (Doc. 12), the Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 10) and all associated hearings and deadlines as set forth therein are hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States of America Notice to Court Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 3091 Notice of Chapter 13 Bankrupcty Case) (Herrin, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America Request to Clerk for Entry of Default against Defendants Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith, and the JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration with attachments, #2 proposed Clerk's Entry of Default) (Herrin, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to meet and confer by 3/12/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 3/25/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/28/2019. (kmt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by San Juan County Treasurer. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Sawyer, Joseph)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. San Juan County Treasurer served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty Lois Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jack D. Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) Modified on 2/6/2019 to indicate filed in error(mnb).
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR***APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Issuance of Summonses to Defendants by United States of America (IRS) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Herrin, Thomas) Modified on 2/6/2019 pursuant to atty request to indicate filed in error; atty will file summons return(s) at a later time(mnb).
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrin, Thomas)
February 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mnb)
February 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (mnb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Griffith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Lois Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack D. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County Treasurer
Represented By: Joseph Foye Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas M. Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?