Zaxcom, Inc. v. Lectrosonics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zaxcom, Inc.
Defendant: Lectrosonics Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00109
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Krukar, Richard)
April 3, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Stay Action Pending Inter Partes Review of the Asserted Patents by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Krukar, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE by Lectrosonics Inc re #58 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Withdrawal of Second Affirmative Defense (Squires, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #65 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference and Related Events. The Court will vacate the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019, and all corresponding deadlines. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
March 25, 2019 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference and Related Events by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Ortiz, Luis)
March 21, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by Zaxcom, Inc. Agreement of Counsel concerning time to file responsive pleading (Ortiz, Luis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Zaxcom, Inc. Agreement of Counsel concerning time to file responsive pleading (Krukar, Richard)
March 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H Krukar on behalf of Zaxcom, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 4/18/2019. (am)
February 25, 2019 Filing 60 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis M Ortiz on behalf of Zaxcom, Inc. (Ortiz, Luis)
February 20, 2019 Filing 58 Lectrosonics, Inc.'s ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint,, Staff Notes, , COUNTERCLAIM against Zaxcom, Inc. by Lectrosonics Inc.(Squires, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Lectrosonics Inc Agreement of Counsel concerning time to file responsive pleading (Squires, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 55 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
February 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (mnb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-03408. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet received via CM/ECF transmission (mnb).
February 8, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Mexico. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's #41 motion to dismiss or transfer for improper venue is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to transfer the file in this matter to the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico and to thereafter close the case. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/1/2019. (Please Note: This case will be transferred to the District of New Mexico in 7 days in accordance with Local Rule 83.1) (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #51 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Bryan Neil DeMatteo terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/31/2019. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #49 Letter filed by Lectrosonics, Inc. stating plaintiff's amended complaint may be unsealed. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/30/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 51 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lawrence S. Rosenthal for Bryan N. DeMatteo by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Seldin Rosenthal on behalf of Zaxcom, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenthal, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 49 Letter to Hon. Judge Garaufis 01/30/2019 by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 48 Letter re Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss/Transfer #41 by Zaxcom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 47 Letter to Judge Garaufis on March 8, 2018 by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit Q, #4 Exhibit AD) (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 45 Letter to Judge Garaufis re Briefing Completed re: Lectrosonics' Motion to Dismiss by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 44 DECLARATION re #43 Reply in Support Supplemental Declaration of Gordon Moore by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY in Support re #41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A(Lec), #2 Exhibit E(Lec), #3 Exhibit R(Lec)) (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit AB, #29 Exhibit AC) (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer the case to the District of New Mexico by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Certificate of Service) (Squires, Jeffrey). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 2/1/2019 (Lee, Tiffeny). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Jeffrey L. Squires (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #38 Proposed Scheduling Order. Lectrosonics to serve its notice of motion and supporting papers by email on or before January 12,2018; Zaxcom to serve its opposition papers by email on or before February 13,2018; and Lectrosonics to serve its reply papers by email on or before March 5,2018. Granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/13/2017. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 38 Proposed Scheduling Order / Joint Letter Motion for Entry of Proposed Revised Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, addressed to the Hon. District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, by Zaxcom, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendant's #35 Application for Pre-Motion Conference: The application is DENIED as unnecessary. By no later than December 11, 2017, the parties are DIRECTED to confer and submit a proposed new briefing schedule for Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss the amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/4/2017. (Pressman, Michael) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zaxcom, Inc. re #35 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Zaxcom's Anticipated Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule for Lectrosonics's Motion to Dismiss, addressed to the Hon. District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 36 Letter to Judge Garaufis with Exhibits A & B, dated November 20, 2017 by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 35 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Zaxcom's Anticipated Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule for Lectrosonics's Motion to Dismiss, addressed to the Hon. District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, by Zaxcom, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zaxcom, Inc. re #33 Amended Complaint,, Sealed, (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lectrosonics, Inc., filed by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal Counsel is directed to file the original document under seal as a separate entry. Instructions on filing sealed documents on ECF are located at www.nyed.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/14/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
November 9, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal (First Amended Complaint) by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service) (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #29 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Zaxcom, Inc. Application granted. Lectrosonics to serve its notice of motion and supporting papers by email on or before November 6, 2017: Zaxcom to serve its opposition papers by email on or before December 8, 2017: and Lectrosonics to serve its reply papers by email on or before December 22, 2017. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/16/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
October 15, 2017 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order / Joint Letter Motion for Entry of Proposed Briefing Schedule, addressed to the Hon. District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, by Zaxcom, Inc. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion to Adjourn 10/6/2017 Conference sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/3/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 6, 2017, addressed to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Reyes, Jr., by Zaxcom, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Supplemental Responses to First Requests for Documents and Things (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Response to NTC of Deposition (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Answers to Zaxcom's First Interrogatories (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Responses to First Request for Documents and Things (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Incorrect Document/Entry Information re Notice(Other), Document #21 : The correct event to use when filing a Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement is Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the heading/subheading Other Filings/Other Documents. Please note this for future reference, the refiling of Document 21 is not required. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/21/2017. (Din, Myra) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE by Lectrosonics, Inc. Defendant's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion of Stipulated Protective Order by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 9, 2017, before Judge REYES. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc.. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2017. (Hong, Loan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/09/2017, before Judge Garaufis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rivka Teich, Telephone number 718-613-2268. Email address: rivkateich@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2017. (Teich, Rivka) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Conference held on 8/9/2017. Appearances: Jeffrey L. Squires, Esq., and David Bruce Wolf, Esq., for Defendant. Rita Chipperson, Esq., and Bryan Neil DeMatteo, Esq., for Plaintiff. Also present was Glen Sanders on behalf of Plaintiff. Discovery related to anticipated motion is to be completed within 60 days and is limited to 5 interrogatories, 5 document requests and 3 depositions of those individuals discussed during conference. Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is instructed to initiate the call and contact chambers once all parties are on the line. (Tape #11:51:46-12:09:51.) (Naidich, Zachary) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/9/2017. Counsel for all parties present. The court granted Plaintiff leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery for the next 60 days and instructed the parties to raise all discovery issues with Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Defendant's time to answer the Complaint is extended until 14 days after jurisdictional discovery is complete. If, after jurisdictional discovery is complete, Defendant wishes to move to dismiss the Complaint, the parties shall confer and submit to the court a briefing schedule for the motion. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich) (Weigel, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
July 17, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Chipperson on behalf of Zaxcom, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chipperson, Rita) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 16 Letter to Judge Garaufis July 11, 2017 by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 15 Letter re Briefing Schedule for Parties' Anticipated Motions by Zaxcom, Inc. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER re Defendant's #11 Application for Pre-Motion Conference and Plaintiff's #14 Application for Pre-Motion Conference. The Applications are GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/6/2017. (Weigel, Jessica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #11 Letter / Cross-Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Zaxcom, Inc.. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bruce Wolf on behalf of Lectrosonics, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wolf, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 28, 2017 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: David B. Wolf is directed to electronically file a Notice of Appearance to ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Squires on behalf of Lectrosonics, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 11 Letter to Hon. Nicholas G. Garaufis by Lectrosonics, Inc. (Wolf, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jeffrey L. Squires Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/23/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Justin R. Muehlmeyer Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/23/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9626338. by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Squires, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9626223. by Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Muehlmeyer, Justin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zaxcom, Inc.. Lectrosonics, Inc. served on 6/12/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/9/2017) (Rocco, Christine). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lectrosonics, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, by Zaxcom, Inc. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 9, 2017 NOTICE: The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions including the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Zaxcom, Inc. (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lectrosonics, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9583174 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Zaxcom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit) (DeMatteo, Bryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaxcom, Inc. v. Lectrosonics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lectrosonics Inc
Represented By: David Bruce Wolf
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Represented By: Justin R. Muehlmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaxcom, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Neil DeMatteo
Represented By: Rita Chipperson
Represented By: Lawrence Seldin Rosenthal
Represented By: Richard H Krukar
Represented By: Luis M Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?