Rodriguez v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rodriguez
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt re remand from the 1st Judicial District Court of New Mexico, Santa Fe County. (gr)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter by Clerk of U.S. District Court to Clerk of First Judicial District Court re Order of Remand back to state court. (bap)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal granting #5 Motion to Remand. This matter shall be remanded to the state court for further proceedings. (anl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Schwarz, Todd)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 02:30 PM via telephone before District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. (anl)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Schwarz, Todd)
February 20, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6292118 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd)
February 20, 2019 District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (kdh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 State Farm's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Schwarz, Todd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-03403. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rodriguez
Represented By: Cloyd G. Hinkle
Represented By: John A Frase
Represented By: Warren F. Hire, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?