Flowers v. Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.

Plaintiff: Laurel Flowers
Defendant: Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Stipulation To Withdraw Application for Default by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack re #23 Stipulation filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (jn)
April 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020, through 10/23/2020, (approximately four (4) to five (5) days), at 09:00 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/11/2020, at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing to obtain your ATT Conference Number and Access Code). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 08/07/2020, at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing to obtain your ATT Conference Number and Access Code). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION for Entry of Default Stipulation to Withdraw Application for Default by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Hutner, Lindsay)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laurel Flowers of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendant (Indahl, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Plaintiff's Deadline to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings is 5/9/2019. Defendant's Deadline to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings is 5/23/2019. Discovery due by 10/7/2019. Discovery Motions due by 10/28/2019. Pretrial Motions due by 11/7/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 1/21/2020 and from Defendant to Court by 2/4/2020. (kfg)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfg) Modified document type on 4/11/2019 (am).
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 4/9/2019. (kfg)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laurel Flowers of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Indahl, Andrew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Laurel Flowers. (Indahl, Andrew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Hutner, Lindsay)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (Hutner, Lindsay)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (Hutner, Lindsay)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Laurel Flowers. (Indahl, Andrew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Hutner on behalf of Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Hutner, Lindsay)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003139 re: 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (mjr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certifying Good Standing (McLean, Jaclyn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. by Jaclyn M McLean on behalf of: Lindsay Hutner Greenberg Traurig, LLP 4 Embarcadero Ctr, Ste. 3000San Francisco, CA 94111-5983 415-665-1312 Fax 415-358-8139 hutnerl@gtlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (McLean, Jaclyn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (McLean, Jaclyn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SF003136 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc from State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2019-00272. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McLean, Jaclyn) filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/15/2019. (kc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
February 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (kdh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc from State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2019-00272. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McLean, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson Tri-Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Jaclyn M McLean
Represented By: Ellen S. Casey
Represented By: Lindsay Hutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Flowers
Represented By: Andrew Berne Indahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?